No. 23-215 | |
Title: | John F. Marchisotto, Petitioner v. Ocean County Prosecutor's Office |
Docketed: | September 7, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division |
Case Numbers: | (A-1026-20) |
Decision Date: | January 26, 2023 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | June 29, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 28 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Oct 24 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023. |
Nov 13 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John F. Marchisotto | 15 Topaz Drive Jackson, NJ 08527 | (732) 526-7732 |
Party name: John Marchisotto |