No. 23-21 | |
Title: | Stuart R. Harrow, Petitioner v. Department of Defense |
Docketed: | July 6, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2022-2254) |
Decision Date: | February 14, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 17, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 03 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 19 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 7, 2023 to September 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 6, 2023. |
Aug 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 6, 2023 to October 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 6, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Scott William Dodson Counsel of Record | UC Law, San Francisco Professor of Law 200 McAlister Street San Francisco, CA 94102 dodson@alumni.duke.edu | 925-285-1445 |
Party name: Stuart R. Harrow | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Department of Defense |