No. 23-191
Title:Nancy Williams, et al., Petitioners
v.
Fitzgerald Washington, Alabama Secretary of Labor
Docketed:August 29, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(SC-2022-0897)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2023 to October 30, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 30, 2023.
Oct 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 30, 2023 to November 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 16 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 20, 2023.
Nov 17 2023Brief of respondent Fitzgerald Washington, Alabama Secretary of Labor in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 06 2023Reply of petitioners Nancy Williams, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 12 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jan 26 2024Suggestion of death and stipulation to dismiss pursuant to Rule 46.1 as to petitioner Cynthia Hawkins filed.
Main Document
Feb 02 2024Writ of certiorari dismissed under Rule 46 as to petitioner Cynthia Hawkins only.
Feb 05 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including April 11, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 25, 2024.
Apr 11 2024Brief of petitioners Nancy Williams, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team and The American Hindu Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Health Law Program, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2024Brief of respondent Fitzgerald Washington, Alabama Secretary of Labor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2024Brief amici curiae of State of Tennessee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUNIKOWSKY@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Nancy Williams, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV
334-242-7300
Party name: Fitzgerald Washington, Alabama Secretary of Labor
Other
Gabriel Joseph Krimm
    Counsel of Record
Tennessee Attorney General and Reporter
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207

gabriel.krimm@ag.tn.gov
6155325596
Party name: State of Tennessee, et al.
Steven Andrew Engel
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

STEVEN.ENGEL@DECHERT.COM
2022613369
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Wendy Liu
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

WLIU@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Brian Paul Morrissey Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street N
Washington, DC 20005

bmorriss@sidley.com
2027368407
Party name: The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team and The American Hindu Coalition
Theresa Marie Sprain
    Counsel of Record
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
2235 Gateway Access Point
Suite 220
Raleigh, NC 27607

tsprain@bakerdonelson.com
(984) 844-7941
Party name: National Health Law Program; Justice in Aging; Judge David L. Brazelon Center for Mental Health Law; National Center for Law and Economic Justice; National Legal Aid and Defender Association