No. 23-183
Title:Eastern Pacific Shipping PTE, Limited, dba EPS, Petitioner
v.
Kholkar Vishveshwar Ganpat
Docketed:August 28, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-30168)
   Decision Date:April 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:May 26, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 24 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 27, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 27, 2023 to November 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 3, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Charles Bond
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

jbond@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Eastern Pacific Shipping PTE, Limited, d/b/a EPS
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Massie Martin Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Lamothe Law Firm, LLC
400 Poydras Street
Suite 1760
New Orleans, LA 70130

rmartin@lamothefirm.com
5047041414
Party name: Kholkar Vishveshwar Ganpat