No. 23-179 | |
Title: | Alaska, et al., Petitioners v. Alaska State Employees Association/American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Local 52, AFL-CIO |
Docketed: | August 25, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Alaska |
Case Numbers: | (S-18172) |
Decision Date: | May 26, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 23 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 25 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Alaska State Employees Association/American Federation of State, County & Municipal Employees Local 52, AFL-CIO to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 28 2023 | Letter of Alaska, et al. submitted. |
Main Document | |
Aug 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Aug 30 2023 | Response Requested. (Due September 29, 2023) |
Sep 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 29, 2023 to October 30, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 07 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 30, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
John Michael Connolly Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Blvd Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22209 MIKE@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM | 7032439423 |
Party name: Alaska, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Matthew John Murray Counsel of Record | Altshuler Berzon LLP 177 Post Street, Suite 300 San Francisco, CA 94108 mmurray@altber.com | 4154217151 |
Party name: Alaska State Employees Association/American Federation of State, County & Municipal Employees Local 52, AFL-CIO |