No. 23-177 | |
Title: | Terrence Fitch, Petitioner v. Thomas McAdams, et al. |
Docketed: | August 25, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-2522) |
Decision Date: | April 18, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 10, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 20 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 01 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Thomas McAdams to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 06 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Lisa Bangert to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 11 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents James Sullivan, Samantha Levign, Aliyya Hunt, Ann Hetzel and John Barrett to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 04 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023. |
Oct 30 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Terrence Fitch Counsel of Record | PO Box 81842 Racine, WI 53405 | 262-672-5416 |
Party name: Terrence Fitch | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
William G. Davidson Counsel of Record | Milwaukee Count Office of Corporation Counsel 901 N 9th Street Milwaukee, WI 53233 william.davidson@milwaukeecountywi.gov | 414-278-4300 |
Party name: James Sullivan, Samantha Levign, Aliyya Hunt, Ann Hetzel and John Barrett | ||
Kevin M. Fetherston Counsel of Record | Von Briesen & Roper, S.C. 411 E. Wisconsin Ave., Suite # 1000 Milwaukee, WI 53202 Kevin.Fetherston@vonbriesen.com | 414-221-6635 |
Party name: Lisa Bangert | ||
Jon Whitney Counsel of Record | Wisconsin Department of Justice P.O. Box 7857 Madison, WI 53707 whitneyjj@doj.state.wi.us | 608-266-1001 |
Party name: Thomas McAdams |