No. 23-175
Title:City of Grants Pass, Oregon, Petitioner
v.
Gloria Johnson, et al., on Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated
Docketed:August 25, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35752, 20-35881)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 5, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2023Brief amici curiae of Freddy Brown, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 19 2023Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Waiver of right of respondent Gloria Johnson, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of District Attorney of Sacramento County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Ben Toma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amici curiae of California State Sheriffs' Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and California Business Properties Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Office of San Diego County District Attorney filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of League of Oregon Cities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of California Governor Gavin Newsom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Brentwood Community Council filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of City and County of San Francisco, et al. filed
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of LA Alliance for Human Rights, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Idaho, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Los Angeles Area Chamber of Commerce, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Venice Stakeholders Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of City of Phoenix, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of City of Los Angeles filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington State Association of Sheriffs and Police Chiefs filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Ten California Cities and The County of Orange filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Bay Area Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Neighbors for a Better San Francisco, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 05 2023Response Requested. (Due November 6, 2023)
Oct 10 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2023 to December 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 12 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2023.
Nov 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of City of Chico filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2023Brief of respondents Gloria Johnson, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 20 2023Reply of petitioner City of Grants Pass filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 12 2024Petition GRANTED.
Feb 16 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 22, 2024.
Feb 21 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Feb 26 2024Brief of petitioner City of Grants Pass filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2024Amicus brief of County of Orange, California not accepted for filing. (March 4, 2024--Corrected verison to be submitted.)
Feb 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of County of Orange, California filed (March 8, 2024).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors Peter W. Low and Joel S. Johnson supporting neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 29 2024Amicus brief of Venice Stakeholders Association not accepted for filing. (March 05, 2024--Corrected verison to be submitted.)
Feb 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of Venice Stakeholders Association filed (March 8, 2024).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 29 2024Amicus brief of California State Sheriffs' Association, et al. not accepted for filing. (March 4, 2024--Corrected efiling to be submitted.)
Feb 29 2024Brief amici curiae of California State Sheriffs' Association, et al. filed (March 7, 2024).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2024Brief amici curiae of State of Idaho, Montana, and 22 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2024Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2024Brief amicus curiae of District Attorney of San Diego County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2024Brief amici curiae of City and County of San Francisco, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2024Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2024Brief amicus curiae of District Attorney of Sacramento County filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Grants Pass Gospel Rescue Mission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Amicus brief of Thirteen California Cities not accepted for filing (March 6, 2024--brief to be recovered).
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Thirteen California Cities filed (March 11, 2024).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor Michael J.Z. Mannheimer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of California Governor Gavin Newsom in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Tiana Tozer, Philip Rhodes, Barbara Jacobsen, Dane Southard, Lorien Ilena Welchoff, Pauline Long, Mark Barnhill, Steve Jackson, Keith Martin and Steven Rebischke filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Los Angeles Area Chamber of Commerce and Central City Association of Los Angeles filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and Retail Industry Leaders Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Amicus brief of League of Oregon Cities et al. not accepted for filing. (March 06, 2024--Corrected verison to be submitted.)
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of League of Oregon Cities et al. (March 11, 2024) filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of City of San Clemente filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Brentwood Community Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Neighbors for a Better San Francisco et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of California in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Manhattan Institute, Stephen Eide, and Judge Glock filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of City of Chico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of San Bernardino County, California filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor John F. Stinneford filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of LONANG Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Research Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Cicero Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Local Government Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Bay Area Council et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of City of Phoenix, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of City of Los Angeles in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of County of Los Angeles in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of International Downtown Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Ben Toma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2024Brief amici curiae of Oregon Quakers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Coalition for Men filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2024CIRCULATED
Mar 27 2024Brief of respondents Gloria Johnson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Chicago Coalition for the Homeless, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2024Brief amicus curiae of Advocates for Empowerment CA filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Los Angeles Catholic Worker, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Current & Former San Francisco Officials and Civic Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Local Progress Impact Lab, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Advocates for Survivors of Gender-Based Violence filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Western Regional Advocacy Project filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Oregon Food Bank, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Southern Poverty Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Criminal Law and Punishment Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and Nineteen Affiliates filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Services Providers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Kairos Center for Religions, Rights and Social Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of The Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Juvenile Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of The Center for Constitutional Rights, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of Fund for Empowerment filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of American Psychiatric Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of The National Homelessness Law Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of National Women's Shelter Network, Inc, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Formerly Incarcerated, Convicted People and Families Movement, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Corporation for Supportive Housing, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of State of Maryland, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Fines and Fees Justice Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Matthew Doherty, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Public Health Professionals and Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of National Alliance to End Homelessness, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of StrongHearts Native Helpline, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of 57 Social Scientists with Published Research on Homelessness filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of The National Police Accountability Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Better Days Ahead Outreach Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors William P. Quigley, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of Emory Civil Rights Society filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Current U.N. Special Rapporteurs filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of Safety Net Project of the Urban Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of National Coalition for Homeless Veterans, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Congressional Amici Curiae filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit on March 6, 2024. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Apr 12 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Apr 12 2024Reply of City of Grants Pass submitted.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theane D. Evangelis
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

TEVANGELIS@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(213) 229-7000
Party name: City of Grants Pass
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

KBC74@GEORGETOWN.EDU
202-661-6728
Party name: Gloria Johnson, et al.
Edward Beman JohnsonOregon Law Center
522 SW Fifth Avenue. Suite 812
Portland, OR 97204

ejohnson@oregonlawcenter.org
503-998-2133
Party name: Gloria Johnson, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Michael Patrick Abate
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Johnson Abate & Bird LLP
710 W. Main St. 4th Floor
Louisville, KY 40202

mabate@kaplanjohnsonlaw.com
502 540-8280
Party name: Local Progress Impact Lab and 156 Current and Former Local Elected Officials
Kirsten Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Southern Poverty Law Center
P. O. Box 10788
Tallahassee, FL 32302

kirsten.anderson@splcenter.org
(352) 318-7284
Party name: Southern Poverty Law Center, et al.
Leslie A. Bailey
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L Street NW
Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

lbailey@publicjustice.net
(510) 622-8150
Party name: 57 SOCIAL SCIENTISTS WITH PUBLISHED RESEARCH ON HOMELESSNESS
Steven Paul Blonder
    Counsel of Record
Much Shelist, PC
191 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 1800
Chicago, IL 60606

sblonder@muchlaw.com
312 521-2402
Party name: Chicago Coalition for the Homeless, et al.
Ricardo Joel Bonilla
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
1717 Main St. Ste 5000
Dallas, TX 75201

rbonilla@fr.com
214-747-5070
Party name: MATTHEW DOHERTY, SHAUN DONOVAN, FRED KARNAS, AND BARBARA POPPE
Eric Samuel Boorstin
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy, LLP
3601 W. Olive Avenue, 8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505

eboorstin@horvitzlevy.com
8189950800
Party name: Los Angeles Area Chamber of Commerce and Central City Association of Los Angeles
David Ryan Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90013

drcarpenter@sidley.com
213-896-6000
Party name: California Governor Gavin Newsom
David Carrillo Casarrubias
    Counsel of Record
Hanson Bridgett LLP
425 Market Street, 26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

dcasarrubias@hansonbridgett.com
415-995-5893
Party name: Bay Area Council et al.
Brigid Finnerty Cech Samole
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
333 S.E. 2nd Avenue
Miami, FL 33131

Brigid.CechSamole@gtlaw.com
305-579-0500
Party name: National Women's Shelter Network, Inc. and National Organization for Women Foundation
David J. Chizewer
    Counsel of Record
Goldberg Kohn Ltd.
55 East Monroe Street
Suite 3300
Chicago, IL 60603

david.chizewer@goldbergkohn.com
312-201-4000
Party name: Formerly Incarcerated, Convicted People and Families Movement, The Shriver Center on Poverty Law, and National Consumer Law Center
David Brandon Conrad
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson P.C.
1717 Main Street, Suite 5000
Dallas, TX 75201

conrad@fr.com
214-747-5070
Party name: Oregon Food Bank, et al.
Gregory Cui
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H Street NE, Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

gregory.cui@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Criminal Law and Punishment Scholars
James Patrick Davy
    Counsel of Record
All Rise Trial & Appellate
P.O. Box 15216
Philadelphia, PA 19125

jimdavy@allriselaw.org
(215) 792-3579
Party name: The National Police Accountability Project and The Law Enforcement Action Partnership
John DiLorenzo Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
560 SW Tenth Ave
Suite 700
Portland, OR 97205

johndilorenzo@dwt.com
5037785216
Party name: Tiana Tozer, Philip Rhodes, Barbara Jacobsen, Dane Southard, Lorien Ilena Welchoff, Pauline Long, Mark Barnhill, Steve Jackson, Keith Martin and Steven Rebischke
Robert Edward Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Eimer Stahl LLP
1999 S. Bascom Ave. Suite 1025
Campbell, CA 95008

RDUNN@EIMERSTAHL.COM
4088891690
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Arizona Chamber of Commerce and Industry, California Chamber of Commerce, Montana Chamber of Commerce, and Oregon Business and Industry
Andrea Chinyere Ezie
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Rights
666 Broadway 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012

cezie@ccrjustice.org
(212) 614-6464
Party name: The Center for Constitutional Rights, et al.
William F. Gary
    Counsel of Record
Harrang Long P.C.
497 Oakway Rd., Ste 380
Eugene, OR 97401

william.f.gary@harrang.com
541-485-0220
Party name: Grants Pass Gospel Rescue Mission
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Deborah Elizabeth Greenspan
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome LLP
1825 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

deborah.greenspan@blankrome.com
202 420 2200
Party name: Amici Curiae STRONGHEARTS NATIVE HELPLINE AND ADDITIONAL TRIBAL ADVOCACY ORGANIZATIONS
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

JEFF@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Cicero Institute
Jennifer Mira Hashmall
    Counsel of Record
Miller Barondess, LLP
2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

MHASHMALL@MILLERBARONDESS.COM
3105524400
Party name: County of Los Angeles
Fred D. Heather
    Counsel of Record
Glaser Weil Fink Jordan Avchen & Shapiro LLP
10250 Constellation Blvd.
19th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

fheather@glaserweil.com
310.553.3000
Party name: Brentwood Community Council
Jennifer Bacon Henning
    Counsel of Record
County Counsels' Association of California
1100 K Street, Suite 101
Sacramento, CA 95814

jhenning@counties.org
916-327-7535
Party name: California State Association of Counties
Thien Ho
    Counsel of Record
Sacramento County District Attorney's Office
901 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

hot@sacda.org
916-874-7000
Party name: Sacramento County District Attorney's Office
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

HHUNT@DEUTSCHHUNT.COM
2028686915
Party name: Fines and Fees Justice Center, Rutherford Institute, and Street Democracy
Alan Michael Hurst
    Counsel of Record
Idaho Office of the Attorney General
700 W. Jefferson Street
Boise, ID 83720-0010

alan.hurst@ag.idaho.gov
2089990910
Party name: State of Idaho, Montana, and Other States
Carmen Gloria Iguina Gonzalez
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clini
2900 Van Ness Street NW
Washington , DC 20008

Carmen.IguinaGonz@howard.edu
917-270-5940
Party name: Professors William P. Quigley, et al.
Tiffany Joy Israel
    Counsel of Record
Aleshire & Wynder LLP
1 Park Plaza
Suite 1000
Irvine, CA 92614

tisrael@awattorneys.com
(949) 223-1170
Party name: Thirteen California Cities
Tiffany Joy Israel
    Counsel of Record
Aleshire & Wynder LLP
1 Park Plaza. Suite 1000
Irvine, CA 92614

tisrael@awattorneys.com
(949) 223-1170
Party name: Ten California Cities and The County of Orange
Caleb Adam Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Environmental Law and Community Engagement Clinic
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

cjaffe@law.virginia.edu
4349244776
Party name: San Bernardino County, California
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

EJAFFE@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Pacific Research Institute
Ronald Alan Jakob
    Counsel of Record
Office of the District Attorney
330 West Broadway
Suite 860
San Diego, CA 92101-3827

Ronald.Jakob@sdcda.org
619-531-3671
Party name: District Attorney of San Diego County
Anit Kumar Jindal
    Counsel of Record
Markowitz Herbold PC
1455 SW Broadway, Suite 1900
Portland, OR 97201

anitjindal@markowitzherbold.com
(503) 295-3085
Party name: League of Oregon Cities et al.
Joel Stephen Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Pepperdine Caruso School of Law
24255 E. Pacific Coast Hwy.
Malibu, CA 90263

joel.johnson@pepperdine.edu
3105067531
Party name: Professors Peter W. Low and Joel S. Johnson
Michelle Shane Kallen
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MKallen@jenner.com
202-639-6093
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and Retail Industry Leaders Association
Andrew Kim
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N Street NW
Washington, , DC 20036

AndrewKim@goodwinlaw.com
202-346-4165
Party name: Fund for Empowerment
Laura Dianne Knapp
    Counsel of Record
Orange County Counsel
400 W. Civic Center Dr., Suite 202
Santa Ana, CA 92701

laura.knapp@coco.ocgov.com
714-834-3300
Party name: County of Orange, California
William Henry Knight
    Counsel of Record
National Homelessness Law Center.
1400 16th Street NW, Suite 425
Washington, DC 20036

wknight@homelesslaw.org
(202) 638-2535
Party name: Congressional Amici Curiae
Paul Robert Koster
    Counsel of Record
Supreme Court Advocacy Program
1301 Clifton Road
Atlanta, GA 30322

PAUL.KOSTER@EMORY.EDU
4047273957
Party name: Emory Civil Rights Society
Marsha Levick
    Counsel of Record
Juvenile Law Center
1800 JFK Blvd., Ste. 1900B
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mlevick@jlc.org
215-625-0551
Party name: Juvenile Law Center, Lambda Legal Defense & Education Fund, Inc., and 223 Experts on Unhoused Youth
Jeffrey Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Jeff Lewis Law, APC
827 Deep Valley Drive
Suite 209
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Jeff@JeffLewisLaw.com
(310) 935-4001
Party name: Venice Stakeholders Association
Angela Marie Liu
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Suite 3400
Chicago, IL 60601

angela.liu@dechert.com
312-646-5800
Party name: The National Homelessness Law Center
James Elliot Lobsenz
    Counsel of Record
Carney Badley Spellman, P.S.
701 Fifth Avenue
Suite 3600
Seattle, WA 98104

lobsenz@carneylaw.com
(206) 622-8020
Party name: Oregon Quakers, et al.
Robert E. Mack
    Counsel of Record
Smith Alling, P.S.
1501 Dock Street
Tacoma, WA 98402

rmack@smithalling.com
(253) 627-1091
Party name: Washington State Association of Sheriffs and Police Chiefs
Christopher George Michel
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I St. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

CHRISTOPHERMICHEL@QUINNEMANUEL.COM
2025388308
Party name: Neighbors for a Better San Francisco et al.
Lila Rebecca Miller
    Counsel of Record
Relman Colfax PLLC
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

lmiller@relmanlaw.com
202-728-1888
Party name: Services Providers
Mark Miller
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Blvd.
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

mark@pacificlegal.org
916-503-9001
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation and California Business Properties Association
Kerry Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Kerry L. Morgan
2915 Biddle Avenue
Suite 200
Wyandotte, MI 48192

kmorgan@pck-law.com
7342817100
Party name: LONANG Institute
Michelle Nicole Pallak Movahed
    Counsel of Record
McCarter & English, LLP,
100 Mulberry Street
Newark, NJ 07102

mpallak@mccarter.com
973-849-4034
Party name: Corporation for Supportive Housing, et al.
Justin Patrick Olson
    Counsel of Record
Bergman Oslund Udo Little, PLLC
520 Pike Street, Suite 1125
Seattle, WA 98101

justin@bergmanlegal.com
(206) 957-9510
Party name: Western Regional Advocacy Project
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
2023267921
Party name: American Psychiatric Association, National Alliance on Mental Illness, National Association for Rural Mental Health, National Association of Social Workers, and The Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law
Justin Scott Pierce
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Coleman PLLC
7730 E. Greenway Road, Suite 105
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Justin@piercecoleman.com
(602) 772-5506
Party name: City of Phoenix & the League of Arizona Cities and Towns
Laura Elizabeth Powell
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
2100 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20037

laura.powell@wilmerhale.com
2026636000
Party name: Public Health Professionals and Organizations
James E. Preston
    Counsel of Record
Hauf & Forsythe
712 H. Street NE
Suite 739
Washington, DC 20002

jep@prestonlawintnl.com
202-643-3917
Party name: National Coalition for Men
Randolph Hunter Pyle
    Counsel of Record
Hunter Pyle Law
505 14th Street
Suite 600
Oakland, CA 94612

hunter@hunterpylelaw.com
5104444400
Party name: Advocates for Empowerment CA
Brandon Michael Rain
    Counsel of Record
Seattle City Attorney
701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2050
Seattle, WA 98104

brandon.rain@seattle.gov
206-684-8200
Party name: Local Government Legal Center, the National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, International Municipal Lawyers Association, North Dakota League of Cities, Cities of Albuquerque, Anaheim, Anchorage, Colorado Springs, Henderson, Lake Oswego, Las Vegas, Redondo Beach, Sacramento, Seattle, and Topeka, the City and County of Honolulu, and Louisville-Jefferson County Metro
Brandon Michael Rain
    Counsel of Record
Seattle City Attorney's Office
701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2050
Seattle, WA 98104

brandon.rain@seattle.gov
206-684-8200
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, National League of Cities, National Association of Counties, North Dakota League of Cities, Cities of Albuquerque, Anchorage, Colorado Springs, Henderson, Las Vegas, Milwaukee, Providence, Redondo Beach, Saint Paul, San Diego, Seattle, Spokane, and Tacoma, the City and County of Honolulu, and the County of San Bernardino
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ERASSBACH@BECKETLAW.ORG
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Teresa Alexandra Reed Dippo
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Avenue
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

TERESA.REEDDIPPO@DOJ.CA.GOV
(415) 510-3896
Party name: State of California
John Michael Reeves Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Reeves Law LLC
7733 Forsyth Blvd.
Suite 1100 - #1192
St. Louis, MO 63105

reeves@appealsfirm.com
314-775-6985
Party name: Members of Congress
Denise Lynn RocawichJones & Mayer
3777 N. Harbor Blvd.
Fullerton, CA 92835

dlr@jones-mayer.com
714446-1400
Party name: California State Sheriffs' Association, et al.
Jonathan Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
Times Square Tower
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

jrosenberg@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: The Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund et al.
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: City of San Clemente
Brunn Wall Roysden III
    Counsel of Record
Fusion Law, PLLC
7600 N. 15th St., Suite 150
Phoenix, AZ 85020

beau@fusion.law
6023157545
Party name: Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Ben Toma and President of the Arizona State Senate Warren Petersen
Eric Golas Salbert
    Counsel of Record
Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin
13181 Crossroads Parkway North - West Tower, Suite 400
City of Industry, CA 91746

esalbert@agclawfirm.com
562-699-5500
Party name: City of Chico
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Jaime Ann SantosGoodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JSANTOS@GOODWINLAW.COM
2023464034
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops as Amicus Curiae
Nadia Ann SarkisMiller Barondess, LLP
2121 Avenue of the Stars
26th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

nsarkis@millerbarondess.com
310-552-4400
Party name: County of Los Angeles
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Matthew A. Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan and Cromwell LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

schwartzmatthew@sullcrom.com
(212) 558-4197
Party name: Professor John F. Stinneford
Joshua Morris Segal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 Saint Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

jsegal@oag.state.md.us
410-576-6446
Party name: State of Maryland, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave.
New York, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute, Stephen Eide, and Judge Glock
Rachel Anne Sheridan
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights
131 Steuart Street, Suite 400
San Francisco, CA 94105

rsheridan@lccrsf.org
4155439444
Party name: Current & Former San Francisco Officials and Civic Organizations
Thomas Samuel Silverstein
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street, NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

TSILVERSTEIN@LAWYERSCOMMITTEE.ORG
(202) 662-8600
Party name: Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Center On Budget and Policy Priorities, and National Low Income Housing Coalition
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

RSIMPSON@WILEY.LAW
202-719-7000
Party name: Professor Michael J.Z. Mannheimer
Clifford M. Sloan
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

Cliff.Sloan@georgetown.edu
202-662-9000
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops as Amicus Curiae
Charles F. Smith Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, et al.
155 North Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

charles.smith@skadden.com
(312) 407-0700
Party name: Kairos Center for Religions, Rights and Social Justice and Other Religious Organizations
Carol A. Sobel
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Carol A. Sobel
2632 Wilshire Blvd.
#552
Santa Monica, CA 90403

carolsobellaw@gmail.com
13103933055
Party name: Los Angeles Catholic Worker, CANGRESS, Venice Justice Committee, Inner City Law Center
Tara Michelle Steeley
    Counsel of Record
Office of the City Attorney
City Hall, Room 234, 1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett
San Francisco, CA 94102

Tara.steeley@sfcityatty.org
4155544655
Party name: City and County of San Francisco and Mayor London Breed
Mary Hirth Tolbert
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
101 N. Robinson Ave
Suite 500
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

molly.tolbert@steptoe-johnson.com
405-930-5155
Party name: Better Days Ahead Outreach Inc.; Homeless Advocacy Project; Regional Housing Legal Services; Morgantown RAMP; Project Rainbow; Kanawha Valley Collective; and SOAR
James R. Touchstone
    Counsel of Record
Jones & Mayer
3777 North Harbor Boulevard
Fullerton, CA 92835

jrt@jones-mayer.com
714-446-1400
Party name: California State Sheriffs' Association, et al.
Joshua Nathaniel Turner
    Counsel of Record
ldaho Attorney General's Office
700 W Jefferson Street
Boise, ID 83720

josh.turner@ag.idaho.gov
2083323548
Party name: States of Idaho, Montana, et. al.
Matthew Donald Umhofer
    Counsel of Record
Umhofer, Mitchell & King LLP
767 S. Alameda St.
Suite 270
Los Angeles, CA 90021

matthew@umklaw.com
213-394-7979
Party name: International Downtown Association, et al.
David Ray Venderbush
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

david.venderbush@alston.com
2122109532
Party name: National Coalition for Homeless Veterans, UCLA Veterans’ Legal Clinic and 43 Other Veterans’ Service Providers
David Ray Venderbush
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

david.venderbush@alston.com
2122109532
Party name: Safety Net Project of the Urban Justice Center
David Ray Venderbush
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

david.venderbush@alston.com
2122109532
Party name: Current U.N. Special Rapporteurs
Michael Martin Walsh
    Counsel of Record
City of Los Angeles, City Attorney
200 North Spring Street, 14th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012

michael.walsh@lacity.org
(213) 978-2209
Party name: City of Los Angeles
Katherine Elizabeth Walz
    Counsel of Record
National Housing Law Project
1275 K St. NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

kwalz@nhlp.org
(312) 345-5104
Party name: Advocates for Survivors of Gender-Based Violence
Jennifer Alicia Wedekind
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
915 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

jwedekind@aclu.org
202-548-6610
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and Nineteen Affiliates
Ilan Wurman
    Counsel of Record
Tully Bailey LLP
11811 N. Tatum Blvd. Suite 3031
Phoenix, AZ 85028

iwurman@tullybailey.com
4809652245
Party name: Freddy Brown, et al.
Lauren Willard Zehmer
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

lzehmer@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: National Alliance to End Homelessness, Funders Together to End Homelessness, and Enterprise Community Partners, Inc.