No. 23-171 | |
Title: | Chris Quinn, et al., Petitioners v. Washington, et al. |
Docketed: | August 23, 2023 |
Linked with 22A1084 | |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Washington |
Case Numbers: | (100769-8) |
Decision Date: | March 24, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 09 2023 | Application (22A1084) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 22, 2023 to July 22, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jun 15 2023 | Application (22A1084) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 22, 2023. |
Jul 07 2023 | Application (22A1084) to extend further the time from July 22, 2023 to August 21, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Written RequestProof of Service | |
Jul 12 2023 | Application (22A1084) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 21, 2023. |
Aug 21 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 06 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Washington, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 11 2023 | Letter from amicus Citizen Action Defense Fund not accepted for filing. (September 12, 2023) |
Sep 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. |
Sep 13 2023 | Motion re Amicus Briefs of Chris Quinn, et al. submitted. |
Main Document | |
Sep 15 2023 | Response Requested. (Due October 16, 2023) |
Sep 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2023 to November 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 3, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Erin E. Murphy Counsel of Record | Clement & Murphy, PLLC 706 Duke Street Alexandria, VA 22314 ERIN.MURPHY@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM | (202) 742-8900 |
Party name: Chris Quinn, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Peter Benjamin Gonick Counsel of Record | Attorney General of Washington 1125 Washington St SE PO Box 40100 Olympia, WA 98504 PETERG@ATG.WA.GOV | 3607536245 |
Party name: Washington, et al. | ||
Other | ||
David Morris Gossett Counsel of Record | Davis Wright Tremaine LLP 1301 K Street NW Suite 500 East Washington, DC 20005 davidgossett@dwt.com | 202-973-4200 |
Party name: Citizen Action Defense Fund |