No. 23-167 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | John Q. Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, Petitioner v. Joseph Clifton Smith |
Docketed: | August 21, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-14519) |
Decision Date: | May 19, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 17 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Idaho, et. al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 20 2023 | Brief of respondent Joseph Clifton Smith in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Sep 20 2023 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Joseph Clifton Smith. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 04 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023. |
Oct 04 2023 | Reply of petitioner Commissioner, Alabama Dept. of Corrections filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 25 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Oct 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023. |
Nov 01 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Nov 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023. |
Nov 08 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Nov 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023. |
Nov 16 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Nov 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023. |
Dec 01 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Dec 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023. |
Dec 15 2023 | Record Requested. |
Jan 02 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024. |
Jan 02 2024 | Electronic record received from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the 11th Circuit. |
Jan 08 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024. |
Jan 09 2024 | Record received from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama (2 boxes). |
Jan 16 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024. |
Feb 09 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. |
Feb 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024. |
Feb 26 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024. |
Mar 11 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024. |
Mar 18 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024. |
Mar 25 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024. |
Apr 08 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. |
Apr 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. |
Apr 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. |
May 06 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024. |
May 13 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024. |
May 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2024. |
May 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024. |
Jun 03 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024. |
Jun 10 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024. |
Jun 17 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024. |
Jun 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr. Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 501 Washington Ave Montgomery, AL 36130 EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV | 334-242-7300 |
Party name: Commissioner, Alabama Dept. of Corrections | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Kacey Keeton Counsel of Record | Federal Defender, Middle District of Alabama 817 S. Court Street Montgomery, AL 36104 kacey_keeton@fd.org | 334-834-2099 |
Party name: Joseph Clifton Smith | ||
Other | ||
Joshua Nathaniel Turner Counsel of Record | ldaho Attorney General's Office 700 W Jefferson Street Boise, ID 83720 josh.turner@ag.idaho.gov | 2083323548 |
Party name: Idaho, et. al. |