No. 23-156
Title:Speech First, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Timothy Sands, Individually and in His Official Capacity as President of the University of Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University
Docketed:August 17, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2061)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 18, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 18, 2023 to October 18, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2023.
Sep 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Parents Defending Education filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Alumni Free Speech Alliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief of respondent Timothy Sands, in his individual capacity and official capacity as President of Virginia Polytechnic Institute, et al. in response filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Lodging proposal letter under Rule 32.3 of respondent filed.
Main Document
Oct 26 2023Reply of petitioner Speech First, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Jan 02 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 16 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024.
Feb 09 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Feb 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024.
Feb 26 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

MIKE@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
7032439423
Party name: Speech First, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
William Henry Hurd
    Counsel of Record
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
919 East Main Street
Suite 1300
Richmond, VA 23219

whurd@eckertseamans.com
8042017846
Party name: Timothy Sands, in his individual capacity and official capacity as President of Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University
Other
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

CCRAWFORD@AFPHQ.ORG
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc.
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street, Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

JHUEBERT@LIBERTYJUSTICECENTER.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Gary Michael Lawkowski
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group
2121 Eisenhower Avenue, Suite 608
Alexandria, VA 22314

GLAWKOWSKI@DHILLONLAW.COM
7035741654
Party name: Alumni Free Speech Alliance, et al.
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Parents Defending Education
Celia Howard O'Leary
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 West Crossville Road Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075

COLEARY@SOUTHEASTERNLEGAL.ORG
7709772131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Abigail Eden Smith
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
510 Walnut St
Suite 1250
Philadelphia, PA 19106

abby.smith@thefire.org
(215) 717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin,LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

GTODD@SIDLEY.COM
2027368760
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom; The Manhattan Institute