No. 23-154 | |
Title: | Frank Kendall, Secretary of the Air Force, et al., Petitioners v. Hunter Doster, et al. |
Docketed: | August 17, 2023 |
Linked with 23A8 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-3497, 22-3702) |
Decision Date: | November 29, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 17, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 05 2023 | Application (23A8) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 16, 2023 to August 16, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 07 2023 | Application (23A8) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until August 16, 2023. |
Aug 16 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 18, 2023) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Aug 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 18, 2023 to October 18, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2023, for all respondents. |
Oct 18 2023 | Brief of respondents Hunter Doster, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023. |
Nov 01 2023 | Reply of petitioners Frank Kendall III, Secretary of the Air Force, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023. |
Dec 01 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Dec 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Frank Kendall III, Secretary of the Air Force, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Thomas B. Bruns Counsel of Record | Bruns, Connell, Vollmar & Armstrong, LLC 4555 Lake Forest Dr., Ste. 330 Cincinnati, OH 45242 tbruns@bcvalaw.com | 513-312-9890 |
Party name: Hunter Doster, et al. |