No. 23-146
Title:Thomas A. Connelly, as Executor of the Estate of Michael P. Connelly, Sr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 16, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3683)
   Decision Date:June 2, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 15 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 15, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 15, 2023 to October 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 16, 2023.
Sep 29 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2023 to October 30, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 30, 2023.
Oct 30 2023Brief of respondent Internal Revenue Service in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 14 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Nov 14 2023Reply of petitioner Thomas Connelly filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 13 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jan 24 2024Brief of petitioner Thomas Connelly filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 29 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 27, 2024.
Jan 31 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit.
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit (1 box) and available with the Clerk.
Feb 14 2024CIRCULATED
Feb 23 2024Brief of United States submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Thomas Connelly
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jonathan Charles Bond
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

jbond@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.