No. 23-14 | |
Title: | Delilah Guadalupe Diaz, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | July 5, 2023 |
Linked with 22A954 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-50238) |
Decision Date: | January 19, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 3, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 28 2023 | Application (22A954) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2023 to July 1, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther | |
May 02 2023 | Application (22A954) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 1, 2023. |
Jun 30 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 4, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 26 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 4, 2023 to September 4, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 27 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 5, 2023. See Rule 30.1. |
Aug 31 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 5, 2023 to September 28, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 01 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 28, 2023. |
Sep 28 2023 | Brief of United States in opposition submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jeffrey L. Fisher Counsel of Record | Stanford Law - Supreme Court Litigation Clinic 559 Nathan Abbott Way Stanford, CA , CT 94305 jlfisher@law.stanford.edu | (650) 724-7081 |
Party name: Delilah Diaz | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |