No. 23-138 | |
Title: | Jackie Williams Simpson, et al., Appellants v. John Thurston, Arkansas Secretary of State |
Docketed: | August 15, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Case Numbers: | (4:22-cv-00213-JM-DRS-DPM) |
Decision Date: | May 25, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 11 2023 | Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due September 14, 2023) |
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 23 2023 | Waiver of right of appellee John Thurston, in His Official Capacity as the Arkansas Secretary of State to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Aug 31 2023 | Response Requested. (Due October 2, 2023) |
Sep 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2023 to November 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 07 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2023. |
Sep 08 2023 | Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from appellant filed. (Received September 12, 2023) |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Appellants | ||
Richard Hartley Mays Counsel of Record | Richard Mays Law Firm PLLC 2225 Cottondale Lane Suite 210 Little Rock, AR 72202 rmays@richmayslaw.com | (501) 891-6116 |
Party name: Jackie Williams Simpson, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Appellee | ||
Nicholas Jacob Bronni Counsel of Record | Solicitor General of Arkansas Arkansas Attorney General's Office 323 Center St., Suite 200 Little Rock, AR 72201 NICHOLAS.BRONNI@ARKANSASAG.GOV | 501-682-6302 |
Party name: John Thurston, in His Official Capacity as the Arkansas Secretary of State |