No. 23-131 | |
Title: | Falkbuilt Ltd., et al., Petitioners v. DIRTT Environmental Solutions, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | August 11, 2023 |
Linked with 22A1120 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-4078 21-4153) |
Decision Date: | April 11, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 23 2023 | Application (22A1120) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2023 to September 8, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 28 2023 | Application (22A1120) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 9, 2023. |
Jul 26 2023 | Application (22A1120) to extend further the time from August 9, 2023 to September 8, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. |
Written RequestProof of Service | |
Aug 01 2023 | Application (22A1120) denied by Justice Gorsuch. |
Aug 09 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 17 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Dirtt Environmental Solutions, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 23 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Sep 11 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Professors Joost Blom, K.C. and Dr. Aubin Calvert filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 02 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Vincent Gregory Levy Counsel of Record | Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP 425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor New York, NY 10017 VLEVY@HSGLLP.COM | 6468375120 |
Party name: Falkbuilt Ltd., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Joel David Bertocchi Counsel of Record | Akerman LLP 71 South Wacker Drive 47th floor Chicago, IL 60606 JOEL.BERTOCCHI@AKERMAN.COM | 312-634-5700 |
Party name: Dirtt Environmental Solutions, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Matthew Eaton Draper Counsel of Record | Draper & Draper LLC 100 Park Avenue Suite 1600 New York, NY 10017 matthew.draper@draperllc.com | 3474427788 |
Party name: Professors Joost Blom, K.C. and Dr. Aubin Calvert |