No. 23-1295 | |
Title: | Linnzi Zaorski, Petitioner v. Nicholas Usner |
Docketed: | June 12, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of Louisiana, First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2022 CA 1326) |
Decision Date: | October 31, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 20, 2023 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | March 12, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 06 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 12, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. |
Aug 15 2024 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Linnzi Zaorski filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 07 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Richard Lynn Ducote Counsel of Record | Richard Ducote, Attorney & Counselor at Law, APLC 318 East Boston Street Second Floor Covington, LA 70433 rducote@ducotelaw.com | (985) 898-2755 |
Party name: Linnzi Zaorski |