No. 23-120
Title:United States Soccer Federation, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Relevent Sports, LLC, et al.
Docketed:August 8, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2088)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:May 8, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 04 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 7, 2023 to October 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 10, 2023. See Rule 30.1.
Aug 22 2023Rule 12.6 letter of Federation Internationale De Football Association received.
Main Document
Sep 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of The American Society of Association Executives filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM
202-637-2207
Party name: United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

LCOBERLY@WINSTON.COM
312-558-5600
Party name: Relevent Sports, LLC
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Federation Internationale De Football Association
Other
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

DONALD.VERRILLI@MTO.COM
202-220-1100
Party name: The American Society of Association Executives
Katherine Crawford Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
700 Colorado Blvd.
#407
Denver, CO 80206

katie@lkcfirm.com
(512) 693-8350
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America