No. 23-1150
Vide 23-1002
Title:Corey Deyon Duffey and Jarvis Dupree Ross, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:April 23, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-10265)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 23, 2024 to May 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2024.
May 29 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 30 2024Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 04 2024Reply of petitioners Corey Duffey, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024.
Jul 02 2024Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 23-1002 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jul 02 2024Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 23-1002. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 23-1002. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

NEAL.KATYAL@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
202 637 5528
Party name: Corey Duffey, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States