No. 23-115
Title:Fathi Elltaif Saad Elldakli, et al., Petitioners
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:August 4, 2023
Linked with 22A1098
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-20344)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2023Application (22A1098) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2023 to August 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 23 2023Application (22A1098) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 2, 2023.
Aug 02 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 5, 2023 to October 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 5, 2023.
Sep 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 5, 2023 to November 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 3, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Fathi Elltaif Saad Elldakli, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Att'y Gen., et al.