No. 23-1127
Title:Wisconsin Bell, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States, ex rel. Todd Heath
Docketed:April 17, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1515)
   Decision Date:January 16, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 15 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2024Brief of respondent Todd Heath in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2024Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2024Brief amici curiae of USTelecom – The Broadband Association and CTIA – The Wireless Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2024Reply of petitioner Wisconsin Bell, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2024Letter of petitioner Wisconsin Bell, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024.
Jun 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
Jun 17 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 15 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 13, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 24, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Wisconsin Bell, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
David J. Chizewer
    Counsel of Record
Goldberg Kohn Ltd.
55 East Monroe Street
Suite 3300
Chicago, IL 60603

david.chizewer@goldbergkohn.com
(312) 201-4000
Party name: Todd Heath
Other
Scott H. Angstreich
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

sangstreich@kellogghansen.com
2023267900
Party name: USTelecom – The Broadband Association and CTIA – The Wireless Association
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation