No. 23-1096
Title:William Allen Davis, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:April 9, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(18CA0641)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 8, 2024

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2024Waiver of right of respondent Colorado to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024.
Apr 23 2024Response Requested. (Due May 23, 2024)
Apr 24 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 23, 2024 to July 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 8, 2024.
May 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2024Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 17 2024Reply of William Allen Davis submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

BANNER@LAW.UCLA.EDU
3102068506
Party name: William Allen Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Shannon Wells Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Department of Law
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

shannon.stevenson@coag.gov
720-508-6000
Party name: State of Colorado
Other
Gregg Jeffrey Costa
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
800 Main Street, Suite 3000
Houston, TX 77002

GCosta@gibsondunn.com
346-718-6600
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers