No. 23-1095
Title:Patrick D. Thompson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2254)
   Decision Date:January 8, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2024 to June 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2024.
May 17 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2024 to July 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 20 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 10, 2024.
Jul 10 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 17 2024Reply of Patrick D. Thompson submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

BANNER@LAW.UCLA.EDU
3102068506
Party name: Patrick D. Thompson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States