No. 23-1084
Title:Jill Hile, et al., Petitioners
v.
Michigan, et al.
Docketed:April 8, 2024
Linked with 23A683
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1986)
   Decision Date:November 6, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2024Application (23A683) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 4, 2024 to April 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 24 2024Application (23A683) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 4, 2024.
Apr 04 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2024Waiver of right of respondents State of Michigan, Gretchen E. Whitmer, Rachael Eubanks to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 30 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024.
May 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2024Brief amici curiae of EdChoice and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2024Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Manhattan Institute and Notre Dame Education Project filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty and The Buckeye Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Foundation for Government Accountability filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of Protect the First Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2024Response Requested. (Due June 12, 2024)
May 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 12, 2024 to July 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2024.
Jul 12 2024Brief of respondents Michigan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley Ave SE #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

JBURSCH@BURSCHLAW.COM
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Jill Hile, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ann Maurine Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
G. Mennen Williams Building
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

SHERMANA@MICHIGAN.GOV
517-335-7628
Party name: Michigan, Gretchen E. Whitmer, Rachael Eubanks
Other
Michael Eugene Bindas
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
600 University Street
Suite 1730
Seattle, WA 98101

MBINDAS@IJ.ORG
2069571300
Party name: Institute for Justice
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty and The Buckeye Institute
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
EdChoice, Inc.
111 Monument Circle
Suite 2650
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tfisher@edchoice.org
317-978-9472
Party name: EdChoice and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the First Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave.
New York, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute and Notre Dame Education Project
Stewart Lee Whitson
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Government Accountability
15275 Collier Blvd
Ste. 201
Naples, FL 34119

stewart@thefga.org
239-244-8808
Party name: The Foundation for Government Accountability
Michael Ray Williams
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex, Bldg. 1, Rm E-26
1900 Kanawha Blvd. E
Charleston, WV 25305

michael.r.williams@wvago.gov
(681) 313-4511
Party name: State of West Virginia and 7 Other States