No. 23-108
Title:James E. Snyder, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 3, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2986)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:July 14, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 01 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 5, 2023 to October 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 5, 2023.
Sep 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 5, 2023 to November 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 6, 2023.
Oct 25 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2023 to November 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 16, 2023.
Nov 16 2023Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed bypetitioner.
Main Document
Nov 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Nov 21 2023Reply of petitioner James E. Snyder filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2023Petition GRANTED.
Dec 18 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 5, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including March 11, 2024. The reply brief on the merits will be filed in compliance with Rule 25.3.
Feb 05 2024Brief of petitioner James E. Snyder filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of James Madison Center for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of Laborers' International Union of North America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of Separation of Powers Clinic filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 15, 2024.
Feb 16 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit.
Feb 22 2024Record received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit and available with the Clerk.
Mar 11 2024Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 20 2024CIRCULATED
Apr 02 2024Reply of petitioner James E. Snyder filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2024Argued. For petitioner: Lisa S. Blatt, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Colleen R. Sinzdak, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa S. Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: James E. Snyder
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: James Madison Center for Free Speech
Terence H. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Cotsirilos, Tighe, Streicker, Poulos & Campbell
55 E. Monroe St.
Suite 3250
Chicago, IL 60603

tcampbell@cotsiriloslaw.com
312-263-0345
Party name: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Leon Dayan
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

ldayan@bredhoff.com
202-842-2600
Party name: Laborers' International Union of North America
Christopher D. Man
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1901 L Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

CMAN@WINSTON.COM
202-282-5622
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Due Process Institute
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Gray Center for the Study of the Administrative St
3301 Fairfax Dr.
Suite 430
Arlington, VA 22201

rmccotte@gmu.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: Separation of Powers Clinic
Brent Thomas Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004-1304

brent.murphy@lw.com
2026371070
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice