No. 23-1072
Title:Ali Hamza Ahmad Suliman al Bahlul, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 2, 2024
Linked with 23A600
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1097, 22-1173)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:October 31, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2023Application (23A600) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jan 04 2024Application (23A600) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2024.
Mar 29 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 2, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2024 to May 31, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 31, 2024.
Apr 24 2024Brief amicus curiae of Association of Professional Responsibility Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Center for Ethics and the Rule of Law at the University of Pennsylvania, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 02 2024Brief amici curiae of James J. Alfini, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 22 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2024 to July 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 24 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 1, 2024.
Jul 01 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 15 2024Reply of petitioner Ali Hamza Suliman al Bahlul filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michel Paradis
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Department of Defense, MCDO
1620 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20301

MICHEL.D.PARADIS.CIV@MAIL.MIL
9175202202
Party name: Ali Hamza Suliman Al Bahlul
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Brenner McGrath Fissell
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Brenner Fissell
408 Saint David's Ave
Wayne, PA 19087

brenner.fissell@gmail.com
5182318532
Party name: Ctr. for Ethics and the Rule of Law & Natl. Inst. of Military Justice
Arden J. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Harrang Long P.C.
497 Oakway Road
Suite 380
Eugene, OR 97401

arden.j.olson@harrang.com
541-485-0220
Party name: Association of Professional Responsibility Lawyers
Meghan Suzanne Skelton
    Counsel of Record
SkeltonLaw, LLC
P.O. Box 308
Cabin John, MD 20818

meghan@skelton.law
2404252280
Party name: James J. Alfini, Charles Gardner Geyh, Bruce A. Green, Renee Knake Jefferson, James J. Sample, Jeffrey Stempel, Keith Swisher, Penny White