No. 23-1067
Title:Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:April 1, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-9514)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 28 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2024)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 1, 2024 to May 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 24 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2024.
May 01 2024Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2024Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senators Mike Lee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2024Brief for the Federal Respondents filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 22 2024Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
May 29 2024Rescheduled.
May 30 2024Reply of petitioners Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
629 W. Main Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

mithun@lkcfirm.com
202-309-6027
Party name: Oklahoma, et al.
Stanford Edward Purser
    Counsel of Record
Office of Utah Attorney General
160 E. 300 S., 5th floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

SPURSER@AGUTAH.GOV
385-382-4334
Party name: State of Utah
Emily Church SchillingHolland & Hart LLP
222 South Main Street, Suite 2200
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

ecschilling@hollandhart.com
2023936500
Party name: State of Utah
Kristina Renee Van BockernHolland & Hart LLP
555 17th Street, Suite 3200
Denver, CO 80202

trvanbockern@hollandhart.com
303-295-8107
Party name: State of Utah
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: EPA, et al.
Other
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

NICHOLAS.BRONNI@ARKANSASAG.GOV
501-682-6302
Party name: State of Arkansas, et al.
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Separation of Powers Clinic, Scalia Law School
3301 Fairfax Dr.
Suite 430
Arlington, VA 22201

rmccotte@gmu.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: U.S. Senators Mike Lee, Cynthia Lummis, Roger Marshall, and Ted Budd