No. 23-1050
Title:Luis Sanchez, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:March 22, 2024
Linked with 23A722
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-11923)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:November 21, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2024Application (23A722) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2024 to April 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Application (23A722) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 20, 2024.
Mar 20 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 22, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2024Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 11 2024Response Requested. (Due May 13, 2024)
Apr 19 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 09 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 13, 2024 to June 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2024Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 12, 2024.
May 13 2024Brief amici curiae of The Rutherford Institute and Manhattan Institute for Policy Research filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2024Brief amicus curiae of Florida Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 12, 2024 to July 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 28 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 10, 2024.
Jul 10 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen Francis Raiola
    Counsel of Record
Kibler Fowler & Cave LLP
100 South Juniper
3rd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19107

sraiola@kfc.law
9145848987
Party name: Luis Sanchez, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Benjamin Conrad Block
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

bblock@cov.com
(202) 662-5205
Party name: The Rutherford Institute and Manhattan Institute for Policy Research
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
6142244422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Christopher Harding Casey
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris, LLP
30 South 17th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103-4196

CHCASEY@DUANEMORRIS.COM
2159791155
Party name: Florida Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Thomas Michael Johnson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

TMJOHNSON@WILEY.LAW
(202) 719-7000
Party name: The Cato Institute and The Goldwater Institute