No. 22O156
Title:New York, Plaintiff
v.
New Jersey
Docketed:March 14, 2022
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2022Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2022Motions for preliminary relief and for expedited consideration of the motion for preliminary relief filed by plaintiff New York.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 21 2022Opposition to motion for preliminary relief filed by defendant New Jersey.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Reply filed by plaintiff New York.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2022The motion for preliminary relief is granted. New Jersey is hereby enjoined from enforcing Chapter 324 or taking action to withdraw unilaterally from the Compact or terminate the Commission pending disposition of the motion for leave to file a bill of complaint and, if granted, disposition of the case.
May 13 2022Brief in response filed by defendant New Jersey.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2022Joint motion for leave to file cross-motions for judgment on the pleadings filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 23 2022Reply filed by plaintiff New York.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint GRANTED. Joint motion for leave to file cross-motions for judgment on the pleadings GRANTED. New Jersey is allowed until August 22, 2022 to file an answer and motion for judgment on the pleadings; New York’s opposition and cross-motion for judgment on the pleadings is due on or before October 21, 2022; New Jersey’s response to New York’s cross-motion and reply in support of its motion is due on or before November 7, 2022; and New York’s reply in support of its cross-motion is due on or before November 22, 2022.
Aug 22 2022Answer of defendant New Jersey filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 22 2022Brief in support of defendant New Jersey’s motion for judgment on the pleadings not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted) (August 25, 2022)
Aug 22 2022Motion for judgment on the pleadings of defendant New Jersey not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted) (August 25, 2022)
Aug 22 2022Motion for judgment on the pleadings of defendant New Jersey filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Aug 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Aug 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of Metropolitan Marine Maintenance Contractors' Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of law professors Janice Griffith, David Horton and Christopher Serkin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of port businesses and other entities filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
P.O. Box 080
Trenton, NJ 08625

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
6094140197
Party name: New Jersey
Other
Jaynee LaVecchia
    Counsel of Record
McCarter & English, LLP
Four Gateway Center
100 Mulberry Street
Newark, NJ 07102

Jlavecchia@mccarter.com
(973) 848-8300
Party name: Law Professors
Ari Matthew Boxer
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
One Lowenstein Drive
Roseland, NJ 07068

mboxer@lowenstein.com
973-597-2500
Party name: Port Businesses and Other Entities
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas, Alaska, Louisiana, Montana, Nevada, South Carolina, Utah, and Virginia
Stephen Blake Kinnaird
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
2050 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

stephenkinnaird@paulhastings.com
202-551-1842
Party name: Metropolitan Marine Maintenance Contractors' Association