No. 22O153
Title:Texas, Plaintiff
v.
California
Docketed:February 11, 2020
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2020Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2020 to May 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted, and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2020.
Apr 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of West Virginia, Kansas, Tennessee, and 16 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2020Brief of defendant California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2020Reply of plaintiff Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Texas
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: California
Other
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: West Virginia, Kansas, Tennessee, and 16 Other States