No. 22O152
Title:Montana and Wyoming, Plaintiffs
v.
Washington
Docketed:January 24, 2020
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2020Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2020 to May 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted, and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2020.
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of The National Mining Association and The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Kentucky, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Motion to further extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2020 to June 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2020Motion to further extend the time to file a response is granted, and the time is extended to and including June 8, 2020.
Jun 08 2020Brief of defendant Washington in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2020Reply of plaintiffs Montana and Wyoming filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Dale Michael Schowengerdt
    Counsel of Record
Crowley Fleck
900 N Last Chance Gulch
#200
Helena, MT 59601

dschowengerdt@crowleyfleck.com
406-457-2040
Party name: Montana and Wyoming
Attorneys for Respondent
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street SE
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-2536
Party name: Washington
Other
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: The National Mining Association and The National Association of Manufacturers
Stephen Chad Meredith
    Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Office of the Attorney General
700 Capitol Avenue, Room 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky, et al.