No. 22O150
Title:State of Arizona, Plaintiff
v.
State of California
Docketed:March 4, 2019
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2019Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2019 to May 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 24, 2019.
Apr 10 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner State of Arizona
Blanket Consent
May 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice Of The Defense Bar and the National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Researchers, Professors and Lecturers of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 24 2019Brief of respondent State of California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2019Reply of petitioner State of Arizona filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
9173197275
Party name: State of Arizona
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3896
Party name: State of California
Other
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
5714510352
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Mary Massaron
    Counsel of Record
Plunkett & Cooney, P.C.
38505 Woodward Ave
Suite 100
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com
313-983-4801
Party name: DRI - The Voice Of The Defense Bar And The National Federation Of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Ronald David Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Mandelbaum Salsburg PC
1270 Avenue of the Americas
Suite 1808
New York, NY 10020

rcoleman@lawfirm.ms
973-295-3654
Party name: Researchers, Professors and Lecturers of Law
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and Cato Institute