No. 22O149
Title:State of Indiana, et al., Plaintiffs
v.
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Docketed:December 14, 2017
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2017Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2018 to March 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2018
Feb 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Association des Éleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Québec, HVFG LLC, and Hot’s Restaurant Group, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Consumer Freedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief of defendant Commonwealth of Massachusetts in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Reply of plaintiffs State of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Napier Dewar
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bessie.dewar@state.ma.us
6179632204
Party name: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Other
Michael Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
The Office of Michael Tenenbaum, Esq.
1431 Ocean Avenue, Ste. 400
Santa Monica, CA 90401-2136

mt@post.harvard.edu
(424) 246-8685
Party name: Association des Éleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Québec, HVFG LLC, and Hot’s Restaurant Group, Inc.
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
5712169450
Party name: Center for Consumer Freedom