No. 22O148
Title:State of Missouri, et al., Plaintiffs
v.
State of California
Docketed:December 7, 2017
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2017Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2018 to March 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2018
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Consumer Freedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Association des Éleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Québec, HVFG LLC, and Hot’s Restaurant Group, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief of defendant State of California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association of California Egg Farmers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2018Reply of plaintiffs State of Missouri, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: State of Missouri, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: State of California
Other
Michael Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
The Office of Michael Tenenbaum, Esq.
1431 Ocean Avenue
Suite 400
Santa Monica, CA 90401-2136

mt@post.harvard.edu
(424) 246-8685
Party name: Association des Éleveurs de Canards et d’Oies du Québec, HVFG LLC, and Hot’s Restaurant Group, Inc.
Richard Peter Hutchison
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
3100 Broadway
Suite 1210
Kansas City, MO 64111

pete.hutch@landmarklegal.org
8169315559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLL C
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Center for Consumer Freedom
Brian Matthew Boynton
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

brian.boynton@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6044
Party name: Association of California Egg Farmers