No. 22O147
Title:New Mexico, Plaintiff
v.
Colorado
Docketed:June 22, 2016
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2016Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Aug 15 2016Order extending time to file a response to the Motion For Leave to File a Bill of Complaint to and including October 21, 2016.
Oct 21 2016Brief of Defendant Colorado in opposition filed.
Nov 04 2016Reply of petitioner New Mexico, Plaintiff filed.
Nov 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 28 2016The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 06 2017Response to the United States' amicus curiae brief by New Mexico, Plaintiff filed.
Jun 26 2017Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint DENIED. Justice Thomas and Justice Alito would grant the motion for the reasons stated in Nebraska v. Colorado, 577 U. S. ___ (2016) (Thomas, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
William James Jackson
    Counsel of Record
515 Post Oak
Suite 900
Houston, TX 77027

bjackson@jgdpc.com
713 355 5050
Party name: New Mexico, Plaintiff
Marcus Joseph Rael Jr.500 Marquette Ave. NW Suite 700
Albuquerque, NM 87102

marcus@roblesrael.com
0505-242-2228
Party name: New Mexico, Plaintiff
Attorneys for Respondent
Frederick R. Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Colorado Judicial Center
1300 Broadway, 10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

fred.yarger@coag.gov
(720) 508-6168
Party name: Colorado
Other
Jeffrey B. WallActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States