No. 22O145
Title:Delaware, Plaintiff
v.
Pennsylvania and Wisconsin
Docketed:May 31, 2016
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 25 2016Documents filed with the Special Master may be found on the Special Master's website at http://ww2.ca2.uscourts.gov/specialmaster/special_145.html
May 26 2016Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Jun 03 2016Brief and Motion for Leave to file Counterclaim filed by Wisconsin.
Jun 14 2016Brief in response of defendant Pennsylvania filed.
Jun 21 2016Letter from State of Wisconsin received.
Jun 23 2016Reply of petitioner Delaware, Plaintiff filed.
Jul 06 2016Brief amicus curiae of Moneygram Payment Systems, Inc. filed.
Aug 01 2016Brief amicus curiae of Unclaimed Property Professionals Organization filed.
Aug 24 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 03 2016The Motion for leave to file a Bill of Complaint and the Motion for leave to file a Counterclaim are granted. This case is consolidated with Original 146 and the parties are allowed thirty days within which to file answers to the Bills of Complaint and the Counterclaims.
Oct 10 2016Motion For leave to amend Bill of Compliant filed by Arkansas, et al.,. (NOT PRINTED) (VIDED)
Oct 28 2016Pennsylvania's Answer and Counterclaims to Delaware's Bill of Complaint filed. (VIDED)
Oct 31 2016Answer of the State of Wisconsin to the Bill of Complaint filed.(VIDED)
Nov 01 2016Answer to Wisconsin's Counterclaim filed by Delaware (VIDED)
Nov 01 2016Answer to Counterclaim filed by Arkansas, et al., Plaintiffs. (VIDED)
Nov 01 2016Answer to Arkansas, et al.'s Bill of Complaint filed by Delaware filed. (VIDED)
Nov 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 11 2016Motion for leave to file bill of third party complaint filed by defendant Pennsylvania. (VIDED).
Nov 18 2016Answer to Pennsylvania's Counterclaim filed by Delaware.(VIDED)
Nov 28 2016The motion of Arkansas, et al., for leave to amend the Bill of Complaint is granted.
Dec 06 2016It has been suggested that the parties are in agreement on the facts relevant to a decision in this action. If this is the case, the parties are invited to file a stipulation of facts in this Court on or before 60 days from the date of this order. If such a stipulation is filed, the Court will set a schedule for briefing the legal issues. If such a stipulation is not timely filed, a Special Master will be appointed to conduct any necessary discovery and to make proposed findings of fact, and the case will proceed in the usual manner.
Dec 28 2016Brief of MoneyGram Payment Systems, Inc. in opposition to Motion for Leave to File Bill of Third Party Complaint filed. VIDED.
Jan 09 2017Motion for leave to amend Bill of Complaint filed by Delaware, Plaintiff. (VIDED)
Jan 09 2017Motion for leave to amend Countercliam filed by defendant Delaware, (VIDED)
Jan 11 2017Reply of respondent Pennsylvania in further support of motion for leave to file Bill of Third Party Complaint filed. VIDED.
Jan 18 2017Response to Delaware's Motion for Leave to Amend Bill of Complaint from Defendant Pennsylvania filed.(VIDED)
Jan 24 2017Response in opposition to Delaware's motion for leave to amend bill of complaint from Wisconsin filed.(VIDED)
Jan 26 2017Response in opposition to Delaware's motion for leave to amend counterclaim from Arkansas, et al., filed.(VIDED)
Feb 01 2017Letter from the Parties in Response to Court's order of December 6, 2016.(VIDED)
Feb 03 2017Reply Brief in support of Motions for leave to amend Bill of Complaint and Counterclaim filed by Delaware, (VIDED)
Feb 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Mar 29 2017It is ordered that the Honorable Pierre N. Leval, of New York, New York, is appointed Special Master in this case with authority to fix the time and conditions for the filing of additional pleadings, to direct subsequent proceedings, to summon witnesses, to issue subpoenas, and to take such evidence as may be introduced and such as he may deem it necessary to call for. The Special Master is directed to submit Reports as he may deem appropriate. The cost of printing his Reports, and all other proper expenses, including travel expenses, shall be submitted to the Court.
Mar 31 2017Oath of Special Master filed
Jul 27 2021First Interim Report of the Special Master received.
Main Document
Jul 27 2021Because the Court has consolidated this case with No. 146, Original, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 145, Original. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 145. Each document submitted in connection with one or both of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in only one of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 04 2021The Report of the Special Master is received and ordered filed. Exceptions to the Report, with supporting briefs, may be filed within 45 days. Replies, if any, with supporting briefs, may be filed within 30 days. Sur-replies, if any, with supporting briefs, may be filed within 30 days. VIDED.
Nov 18 2021Exceptions to Report of the Special Master filed by Delaware. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherOtherOtherProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Motion for leave to file Volume III of appendix under seal filed by Delaware.
Nov 24 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Bankers Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Reply to Delaware's exceptions to Report of Special Master filed by Arkansas, et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of ServiceOther
Dec 20 2021Motion for leave to file Volume III of appendix under seal filed by Arkansas, et al.
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Unclaimed Property Professionals Organization filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2022Sur-reply in support of exceptions to the Report of the Special Master filed by Delaware. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022..
Feb 22 2022Motion of Delaware for leave to file Volume III of its appendix under seal GRANTED. VIDED.
Feb 22 2022Motion of Arkansas, et al. for leave to file Volume III of their appendix under seal GRANTED. VIDED.
Feb 22 2022The Exceptions to the Special Master Report are set for oral argument in due course. VIDED.
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, October, 3, 2022. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
Steven S. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Loeb & Loeb
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
3rd Floor East
Washington, DC 20001

srosenthal@loeb.com
(202) 618-5000
Party name: Delaware, Plaintiff
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Delaware
Attorneys for Respondents
Kathleen A. KanePennsylvania Office of Attorney General
16th Floor, Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120

kkane@attorneygeneral.gov
(717) 787-3391
Party name: Pennsylvania
Matthew Herman Haverstick
    Counsel of Record
One Liberty Place, 46th floor
1650 Market St.
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mhaverstick@kleinbard.com
215-496-7225
Party name: Pennsylvania
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Wisconsin
17 West Main Street
PO Box 7857
Madison, WI 53703

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: Wisconsin
Daniel P. LenningtonDeputy Solicitor General
17 W. Main Street
P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

lenningtonp@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-8901
Party name: Wisconsin
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Arkansas Attorney General
323 Center Street
Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: Arkansas, California, Texas, Wisconsin, Alabama, Arizona, Colorado, Florida, Idaho, Indiana, Iowa, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Maryland, Michigan, Montana, Nebraska, Nevada, North Dakota, Ohio, Oklahoma, Oregon, South Carolina, Utah, Virginia, Washington, West Virginia, and Wyoming
Other
Michael Rato1300 Mt. Kemble Avenue P.O. Box 2075
Morristown, NJ 07962-2075

mrato@mdmc-law.com
(973)-993-8100
Party name: Moneygram Payment Systems, Inc.
Sara A. Lima1717 Arch Street
Ste 3100
Philadelphia, PA 19103

slima@reedsmith.com
(215)-851-8872
Party name: Unclaimed Property Professionals Organization
Lee RudofskySolicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
323 Center Street
Little Rock, AR 72201

lee.rudofsky@arkansasag.gov
(501) 682-6302
Party name: Arkansas, et al.,
Joseph Robert Guerra
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jguerra@sidley.com
202-736-8228
Party name: American Bankers Association
Sara A. Lima
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
Three Logan Square, Suite 3100
1717 Arch Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

slima@reedsmith.com
215 851 8872
Party name: Unclaimed Property Professionals Organization