No. 22O143
Title:Mississippi, Plaintiff
v.
Tennessee, City of Memphis, Tennessee, and Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division
Docketed:June 10, 2014
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2014Documents filed with the Special Master may be found on the Special Master's website at http://www.ca6.uscourts.gov/internet/special_master/special.htm
Jun 06 2014Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Jul 17 2014Order extending time to file response to motion for leave to file a bill of complaint to and including September 5, 2014, for all respondents.
Sep 05 2014Brief of respondent City of Memphis, Tennessee, and Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division in opposition filed.
Sep 05 2014Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Sep 24 2014DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 10, 2014.
Sep 24 2014Reply of petitioner Mississippi, Plaintiff filed. (Distributed)
Oct 01 2014DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014.
Oct 20 2014The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 12 2015Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
May 22 2015Supplemental brief of Mississippi, Plaintiff filed.
Jun 09 2015DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015.
Jun 29 2015Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint GRANTED. Defendants are allowed 30 days within which to file an answer.
Jul 20 2015The time to file an answer has been extended for all defendants to and including September 14, 2015.
Sep 11 2015Answer of Defendants The City of Memphis, Tennessee, and Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division filed.
Sep 14 2015Answer of Defendant State of Tennessee filed.
Sep 16 2015DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2015.
Nov 10 2015It is ordered that the Honorable Eugene E. Siler, Jr., of London, Kentucky, is appointed Special Master in this case with authority to fix the time and conditions for the filing of additional pleadings, to direct subsequent proceedings, to summon witnesses, to issue subpoenas, and to take such evidence as may be introduced and such as he may deem it necessary to call for. The Special Master is directed to submit Reports as he may deem appropriate. The cost of printing his Reports, and all other proper expenses, including travel expenses shall be submitted to the Court.
Nov 18 2015Oath of Special Master filed
Nov 05 2020Report of the Special Master received.
Main DocumentOther

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
C. Michael Ellingburg Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Daniel Coker Horton & Bell, P.A.
440 Old Canton Road
Suite 400
Jackson, MS 39211

mellingburg@danielcoker.com
(601) 969-7607
Party name: Mississippi, Plaintiff
Attorneys for Respondents
Cheryl White Patterson220 S. Main Street
Memphis, TN 38103

cpatterson@mlgw.org
(901)-528-7651
Party name: Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division
Herman Morris Jr.City Attorney
125 N. Main St.
Room 336
Memphis, TN 38103

cityattorney@memphistn.gov
(901) 636-6614
Party name: City of Memphis, Tennessee
Robert E. Cooper Jr.Attorney General
425 Fifth Avenue North
Nashville, TN 37243

tnattygen@ag.tn.gov
(615) 741-3491
Party name: Tennessee
David C. FrederickKellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202) 326-7900
Party name: Tennessee
William Barry Turner
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Attorney General
425 Fifth Avenue North
Nashville, TN 37243

(615) 532-2586
Party name: Tennessee
David Lee Bearman
    Counsel of Record
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.
165 Madison Avenue
Suite 2000
Memphis, TN 38103

dbearman@bakerdonelson.com
901.577.8116
Party name: Tennessee, City of Memphis, Tennessee, and Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division
Other
Eugene E. Siler Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Honorable
310 S. Main Street, Suite 333
London, KY 40741

Eugene_E_Siler@ca6.uscourts.gov
(606) 877-7930
Party name: Special Master
Jeffrey B. WallActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States