No. 22-991
Vide 22-859
Title:George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al., Petitioners
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:April 12, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-61007)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 21, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 10 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 12, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2023Brief of respondent U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 24 2023Reply of petitioners George Jarkesy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sidney Michael McColloch
    Counsel of Record
S. Michael McColloch, PLLC
6060 N. Central Expway, Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75206

SMM@MCCOLLOCH-LAW.COM
2146741868
Party name: George Jarkesy, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission