No. 22-976 | |
Title: | Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners v. Michael Cargill |
Docketed: | April 7, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-51016) |
Decision Date: | January 6, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 06 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2023) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Apr 24 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2023 to June 7, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 25 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2023. |
May 08 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Richard A. Samp Counsel of Record | New Civil Liberties Alliance 1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450 Washington, DC 20036 RASAMP@VERIZON.NET | 202-869-5210 |
Party name: Michael Cargill | ||
Other | ||
Ian Simmons Counsel of Record | O'Melveny & Myers LLP 1625 Eye St., NW Washington, DC 20006-4001 ISIMMONS@OMM.COM | 202-383-5300 |
Party name: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, and Everytown for Gun Safety |