No. 22-96
Title:Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Petitioner
v.
Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.
Docketed:August 1, 2022
Linked with 22A540
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1301)
   Decision Date:May 17, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 7, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Aug 23 2022Brief of respondent Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 07 2022Reply of petitioner Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.
Nov 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Blanket Consent
Nov 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Nov 10 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, January 11, 2023.
Nov 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Nov 17 2022Brief of petitioner Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2022Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 18 2022Record received from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit. The record is available on PACER.
Nov 21 2022Record received from the U.S.D.C. of Puerto Rico. The record is available on PACER.
Nov 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States supporting vacatur filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 29 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 07 2022CIRCULATION
Dec 14 2022Application (22A540) to extend the time to file a reply brief on the merits from December 30, 2022 to January 3, 2023, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 16 2022Application (22A540) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file the reply brief on the merits until January 3, 2023.
Dec 19 2022Brief of respondent Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Asociación de Periodistas de Puerto Rico filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Dec 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 20 Media Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of GFR Media, LLC (El Nuevo Día/Primera Hora) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2022Brief amici curiae of LatinoJustice PRLDEF, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Speaker of the Puerto Rico House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amici curiae of Clemente Properties Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Espacios Abiertos filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amici curiae of Puerto Rican Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2022Brief amici curiae of Institute for Energy Economics and Financial Analysis, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Reply of petitioner Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2023Argued. For petitioner: Mark D. Harris, New York, N. Y. For United States, as amicus curiae, supporting vacatur: Aimee W. Brown, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Sarah M. Harris, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mbienenstock@proskauer.com
(212) 969-4530
Party name: Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Rafael A. Cox Alomar
    Counsel of Record
University of the District of Columbia
4200 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20008

rafael.coxalomar@udc.edu
(202) 207-6627
Party name: GFR Media, LLC (El Nuevo Día/Primera Hora)
Brendan Colin Benedict
    Counsel of Record
Benedict Law Group PLLC
322 G St. NE
Washington, DC 20002

brendan@benedictlawgroup.com
2122879501
Party name: Espacios Abiertos
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 20 Media Organizations
Ariadna Michelle Godreau Aubert
    Counsel of Record
Ayuda Legal Puerto Rico
180 Ave Hostos 1103 B
San Juan, PR 00918

ariadna@ayudalegalpr.org
787-585-1022
Party name: Asociación de Periodistas de Puerto Rico
Jorge Martinez-Luciano
    Counsel of Record
ML & RE Law Office
Cobian's Plaza, Suite 404
1607 Ponce De Leon Ave.
San Juan, PR 00909

jorge@mlrelaw.com
7879992972
Party name: Hon. Rafael Hernandez-Montanez, in his official capacity as Speaker of the Puerto Rico House of Representatives
Hiram Alberto Melendez-Juarbe
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 193063
San Juan, PR 00919-3063

hiram@melendezjuarbe.com
787-415-5192
Party name: Puerto Rican Legal Scholars
Jessica Esther Mendez
    Counsel of Record
Bufete Emmanuelli, C.S.P.
P.O. Box 10779
Ponce, PR 00732

jessica@emmanuelli.law
787-848-0666
Party name: Institute for Energy Economics and Financial Analysis, CAMBIO PR, Citizens' Commission for a Comprehensive Audit of the Public Credit, Sembrando Sentido, Inc., Liga de Ciudades de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez
    Counsel of Record
Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez
Ave. Ponce de León 1225
VIG Tower, Suite 1500
San Juan, PR 00907

tanairapadilla@yahoo.com
787-620-0527
Party name: Clemente Properties Inc.; 21 In Right Inc.; Roberto Clemente Jr.; Luis Roberto Clemente; Roberto Enrique Clemente
Steven Alan Zalesin
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

sazalesin@pbwt.com
2123362000
Party name: LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Hispanic Federation, and Long Island Hispanic Bar Association