No. 22-957 | |
Title: | Laurie A. Dermody, Petitioner v. Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services |
Docketed: | March 31, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts |
Case Numbers: | (SJC-13199) |
Decision Date: | January 27, 2023 Rule 12.4 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 29 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 27 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Chapter of the National Academy of Elder Law Attorneys filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 01 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
May 09 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023. |
May 11 2023 | Response Requested. (Due June 12, 2023) |
May 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 12, 2023 to July 12, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 18 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Adam G. Unikowsky Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Avenue, NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 AUNIKOWSKY@JENNER.COM | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: Laurie A. Dermody, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Katherine Brady Dirks Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General of Massachusetts 1 Ashburton Place Boston, MA 02108 KATHERINE.DIRKS@MASS.GOV | 617-963-2277 |
Party name: Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services | ||
Other | ||
Patricia Frances Keane Martin Counsel of Record | Seegel Lipshutz Lo & Martin, LLP 80 William Street, Suite 200 Wellesley, MA 02481 pkmartin@sllm-law.com | 781-591-4147 |
Party name: Massachusetts Chapter of the National Academy of Elder Law Attorneys |