No. 22-955
Title:Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe, Petitioner
v.
City of Seattle, Washington, et al.
Docketed:March 30, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-35000)
   Decision Date:December 30, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:January 26, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 28 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2023Waiver of right of respondent City of Seattle to respond filed.
Main Document
May 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023.
May 08 2023Response Requested. (Due June 7, 2023)
May 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 7, 2023 to July 7, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 7, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jack Warren Fiander
    Counsel of Record
Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe
5808A Summitview Avenue
#93
Yakima, WA 98908

TOWTNUKLAW@MSN.COM
5099694436
Party name: Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe
Attorneys for Respondents
Kari Lee Vander Stoep
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
925 4th Avenue
Suite 2900
Seattle, WA 98104

KARI.VANDERSTOEP@KLGATES.COM
206-623-7580
Party name: City of Seattle
Robert Bertelson Mitchell Jr.K&L Gates LLP
925 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2900
Seattle, WA 98104-1158

ROB.MITCHELL@KLGATES.COM
(206) 370-7640
Party name: City of Seattle