No. 22-92
Title:Michael Banerian, et al., Appellants
v.
Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:August 1, 2022
Linked with 21A831
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(1:22-cv-54)
   Decision Date:April 1, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2022Application (21A831) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from June 28, 2022 to July 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Application (21A831) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 28, 2022.
Jul 28 2022Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due August 31, 2022)
Jurisdictional StatementCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2022 to September 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2022, for all respondents.
Sep 30 2022Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Michigan Independent Citizens Redistricting Commission.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2022Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by Individual Voter Intervenors-Appellees.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2022Response to jurisdictional statement from appellee Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Secretary of State filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 30 2022Motion to affirm filed by Voters Not Politicians.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jtorchinsky@holtzmanvogel.com
540 341 8808
Party name: Michael Banerian, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Secretary of State
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Joan Swartz McKay, et al.
Richard Bryan Raile
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave NW, Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

rraile@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1711
Party name: Douglas Clark; Juanita Curry; Anthony Eid; Rhonda Lange; Steven Terry Lett; Brittni Kellom; Cynthia Orton; M.C. Rothhorn; Rebecca Szetela; Janice Vallette; Erin Wagner; Richard Weiss; Dustin Witjes
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Voters Not Politicians