No. 22-915 | |
Title: | United States, Petitioner v. Zackey Rahimi |
Docketed: | March 21, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-11001) |
Decision Date: | March 2, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 17 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2023) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Apr 10 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2023 to May 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2023. |
Apr 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of California Governor Gavin Newsom filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Texas Advocacy Project filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Gun Violence and Domestic Violence Prevention Groups filed. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of New York County Lawyers Association filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Illinois, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Joshua Horwitz, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 23, 2023 to June 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 16 2023 | Response to motion to extend the time to file a response filed. |
Main Document | |
May 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including May 30, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
James Matthew Wright Counsel of Record | Office of the Federal Public Defender 500 S. Taylor Suite 110 Amarillo, TX 79109 MATTHEW_WRIGHT@FD.ORG | 8063242370 |
Party name: Zackey Rahimi | ||
Other | ||
Michael R. Dreeben Counsel of Record | O’Melveny & Myers LLP 1625 Eye Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 MDREEBEN@OMM.COM | 202-383-5300 |
Party name: Gun Violence and Domestic Violence Prevention Groups | ||
Jane Elinor Notz Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois 100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor Chicago, IL 60601 JANE.NOTZ@ILAG.GOV | 312-814-5376 |
Party name: Illinois et al. | ||
Nicole A. Saharsky Counsel of Record | Mayer Brown LLP 1999 K Street NW Washington, DC 20006 NSAHARSKY@MAYERBROWN.COM | 202-263-3000 |
Party name: Joshua Horwitz, Kelly Roskam, Timothy Carey, and 12 Other Public-Health Researchers and Lawyers | ||
Fredericka Searle Sargent Counsel of Record | Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney 401 W. Belknap Fort Worth, TX 76196 fsargent@tarrantcountytx.gov | 8178843109 |
Party name: Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney et al | ||
Benjamin Gross Shatz Counsel of Record | Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP 2049 Century Park East Suite 1700 Los Angles, CA 90067-3119 bshatz@manatt.com | 3103124383 |
Party name: New York County Lawyers Association | ||
James Reid Sigel Counsel of Record | Morrison & Foerster, LLP 425 Market St. San Francisco, CA 94105 JSIGEL@MOFO.COM | 415-268-6948 |
Party name: California Governor Gavin Newsom | ||
C. Andrew Weber Counsel of Record | Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP 303 Colorado Street Suite 2000 Austin, TX 78701 ANDREW.WEBER@KELLYHART.COM | 512-495-6451 |
Party name: Texas Advocacy Project |