No. 22-913
Title:Richard Devillier, et al., Petitioners
v.
Texas
Docketed:March 20, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-40750)
   Decision Date:November 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:January 11, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2023Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 29 2023Supplemental brief of petitioners Richard Devillier, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023.
Apr 10 2023Response Requested. (Due May 10, 2023)
Apr 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2023 to June 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 9, 2023.
May 10 2023Brief amici curiae of Ilya Somin and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 09 2023Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 23 2023Reply of petitioners Richard Devillier, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2023Brief of petitioners Richard Devillier, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 16, 2024.
Nov 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Ilya Somin, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2023Amicus brief of American Farm Bureau Federation not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission - November 21, 2023)
Nov 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Ernest A. Young filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of National Association of Realtors®, American Property Owners Alliance, and Texas Realtors® filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Carlos M. Vázquez filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors James W. Ely, Jr., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Nov 30 2023Record received from the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. The record is electronic and is available with the Clerk.
Dec 12 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 13 2023Brief of Texas not accepted for filing. (December 13, 2023 - Corrected electronic documents submitted.)
Dec 13 2023Brief of respondent Texas (DEC. 19, 2023) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 20 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Minnesota, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Jan 05 2024Reply of petitioners Richard Devillier, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Argued. For petitioners: Robert J. McNamara, Arlington, Va. For respondent: Aaron L. Nielson, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert James McNamara
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

RMCNAMARA@IJ.ORG
703-682-9320
Party name: Richard Devillier, et al.
Christen Mason HebertInstitute for Justice
816 Congress Avenue, Suite 970
Austin, TX 78701

chebert@ij.org
512-480-5936
Party name: Richard Devillier, et al.
Andrew Heller WardInstitute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

andrew.ward@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Richard Devillier, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Lanora Christine PettitOffice of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Judd Edward Stone IITexas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

JUDD.STONE@OAG.TEXAS.GOV
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
453 S. Spring St.
Suite 400-1458
Los Angeles, CA 90013

PAUL.BEARD@FISHERBROYLES.COM
818-216-3988
Party name: American Farm Bureau Federation
Gregg Jeffrey Costa
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
811 Main Street, Suite 3000
Houston, TX 77002

GCosta@gibsondunn.com
346.718.6600
Party name: Professor Ernest A. Young
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Felicia H. Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

felicia.ellsworth@wilmerhale.com
617-526-6687
Party name: Professor Carlos M. Vázquez
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

LIZ.KRAMER@AG.STATE.MN.US
6517571010
Party name: Minnesota, Alabama, Alaska, Idaho, Indiana, Louisiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, New Jersey, North Carolina, North Dakota, Ohio, Oklahoma, Oregon, South Carolina, Utah and Virginia
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLAFETRA@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLAFETRA@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
(916) 419-7111
Party name: National Federation of Independant Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc., and Manhattan Institute
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLAFETRA@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Center, Inc., and Manhattan Instistute
Caroline Cook Lindsay
    Counsel of Record
Hilgers Graben PLLC
332 S Michigan Avenue, Suite 121 #5612
Chicago, IL 60604

CLINDSAY@HILGERSGRABEN.COM
402-313-3480
Party name: Ilya Somin and Cato Institute
Gerald Brinton Lucas
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

blucas@jonesday.com
202-879-3686
Party name: National Association of Realtors®, American Property Owners Alliance, and Texas Realtors®
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

JMARWELL@VELAW.COM
202-639-6507
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Thomas Glenn Saunders
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037

THOMAS.SAUNDERS@WILMERHALE.COM
202-663-6536
Party name: Professors James W. Ely, Jr., and Julia Mahoney and The Buckeye Institute
Brett A. ShumateJones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

BSHUMATE@JONESDAY.COM
202-879-3939
Party name: National Association of Realtors®, American Property Owners Alliance, and Texas Realtors®
Robert H. ThomasPacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Ste 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

RTHOMAS@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation