No. 22-90
Title:NGL Supply Wholesale, L.L.C., Petitioner
v.
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 29, 2022
Linked with 21A844
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1330)
   Decision Date:January 25, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:March 28, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2022Application (21A844) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 26, 2022 to July 26, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 23 2022Application (21A844) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 26, 2022.
Jul 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 29, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
2101 L Street, NW
Washington, DC 20037

drayed@gtlaw.com
(202) 331-3100
Party name: NGL Supply Wholesale, L.L.C.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Energy Commission