No. 22-899 | |
Title: | Jason Smith, Petitioner v. Arizona |
Docketed: | March 16, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One |
Case Numbers: | (1 CA-CR 21-0451) |
Decision Date: | July 14, 2022 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | January 6, 2023 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 14 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 07 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Arizona to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 19 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. |
Apr 25 2023 | Response Requested. (Due May 25, 2023) |
May 18 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 25, 2023 to June 26, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 19 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 26, 2023. |
Jun 26 2023 | Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 11 2023 | Reply of petitioner Jason Smith filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 12 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Sep 29 2023 | Petition GRANTED. |
Nov 13 2023 | Brief of petitioner Jason Smith filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 13 2023 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 17 2023 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, January 10, 2024. |
Nov 17 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of National College for DUI Defense, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Alameda County Public Defender, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of The Innocence Network, Forensic Justice Project, et al.. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Richard D. Friedman filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 21 2023 | Record requested from the Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One. |
Nov 28 2023 | Motion of United States for leave to participate in oral argument and for divided argument submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 30 2023 | CIRCULATED |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Hari Santhanam Counsel of Record | Perkins Coie LLP 110 North Wacker Drive Chicago, IL 60606 HSANTHANAM@PERKINSCOIE.COM | 3123248447 |
Party name: Jason Smith | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Alexander Westbrook Samuels Counsel of Record | Arizona Attorney General's Office 2005 N. Central Ave. Phoenix, AZ 85004 ALEXANDER.SAMUELS@AZAG.GOV | 602-542-4686 |
Party name: Arizona | ||
Other | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Michelle Lynn Behan Counsel of Record | The Behan Law Group, PLLC 945 N. Stone Ave. Tucson, AZ 85705 michelle.behan@missduiarizona.com | 5202205047 |
Party name: National College for DUI Defense, Inc. | ||
Richard D. Friedman Counsel of Record | 625 South State Street Ann Arbor, MI 48109-1215 rdfrdman@umich.edu | (734) 647-1078 |
Party name: Richard D. Friedman | ||
Timothy Patrick O'Toole Counsel of Record | Miller & Chevalier Chartered 900 Sixteenth St., NW Washington, DC 20006 totoole@milchev.com | 202-626-5552 |
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, American Civil Liberties Union, and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Arizona | ||
Anna K. Sortun Counsel of Record | Tonkon Torp LLP 888 SW Fifth Avenue Suite 1600 Portland, OR 97204 anna.sortun@tonkon.com | 503-802-2107 |
Party name: THE INNOCENCE NETWORK, FORENSIC JUSTICE PROJECT, AND THE CENTER FOR INTEGRITY IN FORENSIC SCIENCES, INC. | ||
Joshi Ashoma Valentine Counsel of Record | Alameda County Public Defenders 1401 Lakeside Drive, Suite 400 Oakland, CA 94612 joshi.valentine@acgov.org | (510) 268-7486 |
Party name: Alameda County Public Defender and California Public Defenders Association |