No. 22-896
Title:The Ohio State University, Petitioner
v.
Steve Snyder-Hill, et al.
Docketed:March 16, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3981, 21-3991)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:December 14, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2023Waiver of right of respondent Steve Snyder-Hill, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Association of American Universities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
May 02 2023Response Requested. (Due June 1, 2023)
May 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2023 to June 30, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 09 2023Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner The Ohio State University filed.
Main Document
May 10 2023The motion to extend the time to file a response is denied.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM
202-637-2207
Party name: The Ohio State University
Attorneys for Respondents
Alexandra Zoe Brodsky
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L Street, N.W. Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

ABRODSKY@PUBLICJUSTICE.NET
202-797-8600
Party name: Steve Snyder-Hill, et al.
Other
Noel John Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

NJFRANCISCO@JONESDAY.COM
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Association of American Universities and Twenty-Three Institutions of Higher Education