No. 22-888 | |
Title: | James R. Rudisill, Petitioner v. Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs |
Docketed: | March 15, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2020-1637) |
Decision Date: | December 15, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 13 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2023 to May 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 28 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2023. |
Apr 14 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Virginia, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 14 2023 | Brief amici curiae of 7 Veterans filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 14 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of The Edison Electric Institute filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 14 2023 | Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 15 2023 | Brief of respondent Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 25 2023 | Reply of James R. Rudisill submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Misha Tseytlin Counsel of Record | Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP 227 West Monroe Suite 3900 Chicago, IL 60606 MISHA.TSEYTLIN@TROUTMAN.COM | 608-999-1240 |
Party name: James R. Rudisill | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Denis McDonough | ||
Other | ||
Andrew Nathan Ferguson Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 202 North Ninth Street Richmond, VA 23219 AFERGUSON@OAG.STATE.VA.US | 8047867704 |
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia | ||
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald Counsel of Record | McGuireWoods LLP 800 East Canal Street Richmond, VA 23219 MFITZGERALD@MCGUIREWOODS.COM | 804-775-4716 |
Party name: 7 Veterans | ||
Michael Edward Kenneally Jr. Counsel of Record | Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP 1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20004 MICHAEL.KENNEALLY@MORGANLEWIS.COM | (202) 739-3000 |
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al. | ||
Elbert Lin Counsel of Record | Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP 951 E. Byrd Street Riverfront Plaza, East Tower Richmond, VA 23219-4074 ELIN@HUNTONAK.COM | 804-788-7202 |
Party name: The Edison Electric Institute (EEI) |