No. 22-886
Title:Blenheim Capital Holdings Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
Lockheed Martin Corporation, et al.
Docketed:March 15, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2104)
   Decision Date:November 15, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:December 13, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2023Waiver of right of respondents Airbus Defence and Space SAS to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 04 2023Waiver of right of respondent Lockheed Martin Corporation to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
May 02 2023Response Requested. (Due June 1, 2023)
May 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2023 to July 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 23 2023Letter pursuant to Rule 12.6 from counsel for petitioners filed.
Main Document
May 23 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 3, 2023.
Jun 30 2023Brief of respondent Lockheed Martin Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2023Reply of petitioners Blenheim Capital Holdings Ltd., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Oct 02 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 14 2024Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 24 2024Supplemental Brief of Blenheim Capital Holdings Ltd., et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Hamish Hume
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

HHUME@BSFLLP.COM
(202) 237-2727
Party name: Blenheim Capital Holdings Ltd., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Marc L. Greenwald
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urqhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010

MARCGREENWALD@QUINNEMANUEL.COM
2128497140
Party name: Airbus Defence and Space SAS
Brian Tully McLaughlinCrowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-2595

bmclaughlin@crowell.com
202-624-2628
Party name: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

NSAHARSKY@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3052
Party name: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States