No. 22-884 | |
Title: | Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, Petitioner v. Varinder Singh |
Docketed: | March 14, 2023 |
Linked with 22A584 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-70050) |
Decision Date: | February 4, 2022 Rule 12.4 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 12, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 29 2022 | Application (22A583) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2023 to February 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Dec 29 2022 | Application (22A584) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2023 to February 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Dec 29 2022 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Dec 30 2022 | Application (22A583) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 9, 2023. |
Dec 30 2022 | Application (22A584) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 9, 2023. |
Jan 27 2023 | Application (22A583) to extend further the time from February 9, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Jan 27 2023 | Application (22A584) to extend further the time from February 9, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Jan 27 2023 | Application (22A583) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 10, 2023. |
Jan 27 2023 | Application (22A584) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 10, 2023. |
Mar 10 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2023) |
Mar 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2023 to May 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Mar 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2023, for all respondents. See Rule 30.1. |
Mar 28 2023 | Motion of respondent Raul D. Mendiz-Colin to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2023 to May 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Mar 29 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2023, for all respondents. |
Apr 27 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 15, 2023 to May 22, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Apr 28 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 22, 2023, for all respondents. |
May 22 2023 | Brief of Varinder Singh in opposition submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 22 2023 | Brief of Raul Daniel Mendez-Colin in opposition submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Att'y Gen. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Saad Ahmad Counsel of Record | Saad Ahmad and Associates 39111 Paseo Padre Pkwy Suite 217 Fremont, CA 94538 saadahmadlawfirm@gmail.com | 510-713-9847 |
Party name: Varinder Singh | ||
Easha Anand Counsel of Record | Stanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic 559 Nathan Abbott Way Stanford, CA 94305 EANAND@STANFORD.EDU | (650) 724-3345 |
Party name: Raul Daniel Mendez-Colin | ||
Easha Anand | Stanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic 559 Nathan Abbott Way Stanford, CA 94305 EANAND@STANFORD.EDU | (650) 724-3345 |
Party name: Varinder Singh |